MN HF1012 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Home and community based setting residency ratio restrictions modified.
Title
Home and community based setting residency ratio restrictions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2015-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1012 (Similar To) 2015-04-14 - Second reading