MN HF10 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-14 - Authors added Erickson and Myhra
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-14 - Authors added Erickson and Myhra
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Taxable income subtraction allowed, corporate franchise tax rates reduced, and sales tax exemption allowed for capital equipment at time of purchase.
Title
Taxable income subtraction allowed, corporate franchise tax rates reduced, and sales tax exemption allowed for capital equipment at time of purchase.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | House | Authors added Erickson and Myhra |
2011-03-10 | House | Author added Doepke |
2011-01-18 | House | Authors added Abeler and Shimanski |
2011-01-13 | House | Authors added Kieffer, Mack, Stensrud, Scott, Holberg, Murdock and Dettmer |
2011-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0010&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF10&version=0&session=ls87 |