MI SR0036 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - Adopted As Substituted S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - Adopted As Substituted S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution of support for an initiative to bring the first Fisher House to Michigan.
Title
A resolution of support for an initiative to bring the first Fisher House to Michigan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Senate | Adopted As Substituted S-1 |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Adopted |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rebekah Warren |