MI SCR0016 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology
Pending: House Energy And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology
Pending: House Energy And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging the President of the United States, the Secretary of State, and the Congress of the United States to invoke the participation of the International Joint Commission under Article IX, Article X, or both, of the Boundary Waters Treaty to evaluate the proposed underground nuclear waste repository in Ontario, Canada, and similar facilities.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging the President of the United States, the Secretary of State, and the Congress of the United States to invoke the participation of the International Joint Commission under Article IX, Article X, or both, of the Boundary Waters Treaty to evaluate the proposed underground nuclear waste repository in Ontario, Canada, and similar facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2014-06-12 | House | Received In House |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Phillip Pavlov |