MI SCR0007 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Adopted As Substituted H1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Adopted As Substituted H1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to support the recommendations of the Chicago Area Waterway System Advisory Committee to prevent Asian carp from entering the Great Lakes.
Title
A concurrent resolution to support the recommendations of the Chicago Area Waterway System Advisory Committee to prevent Asian carp from entering the Great Lakes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Senate | Adopted As Substituted H1 |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Returned From House With Substitute H1 |
2017-11-28 | House | Adopted And Returned |
2017-11-28 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Tourism And Outdoor Recreation |
2017-03-23 | House | Received In House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Proos |