MI SB1486 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0375'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0375'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities; other; body art facility licensure; enhance enforcement provisions for local health departments and provide for other general amendments. Amends secs. 13101, 13102, 13104, 13105, 13106, 13107, 13108, 13109, 13110 & 13111 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.13101 et seq.); adds secs. 13105a & 13112 & repeals sec. 13103 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.13103).
Title
Health facilities; other; body art facility licensure; enhance enforcement provisions for local health departments and provide for other general amendments. Amends secs. 13101, 13102, 13104, 13105, 13106, 13107, 13108, 13109, 13110 & 13111 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.13101 et seq.); adds secs. 13105a & 13112 & repeals sec. 13103 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.13103).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0375'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2010 @ 2:32 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/22/2010 @ 1:48 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/10/2010 @ 4:13 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-02 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-11-30 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-11-30 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-11-30 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 497 Yeas 57 Nays 45 | |
2010-11-30 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-11-30 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-30 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-11-30 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-09-29 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | |
2010-09-29 | Read A First Time | |
2010-09-28 | Received On 09/28/2010 | |
2010-09-28 | Passed Roll Call # 477 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-09-23 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-09-23 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-09-21 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-09-21 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-09-21 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-09-14 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
Subjects
Health facilities, licensing
Health facilities, other
Health, local health departments
Health, occupations
State agencies (existing), community health
Health facilities, other
Health, local health departments
Health, occupations
State agencies (existing), community health