MI SB1410 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0347'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0347'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; other; girl scouts of Michigan fund act; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1409'10
Title
Income tax; other; girl scouts of Michigan fund act; create. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1409'10
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0347'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2010 @ 4:12 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/21/2010 @ 12:23 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Presented To Governor 12/20/2010 @ 12:04 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-15 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-15 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 621 Yeas 84 Nays 12 | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-15 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-12-15 | Placed On Second Reading | |
2010-12-15 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | |
2010-12-15 | Rule Suspended | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | |
2010-11-10 | Read A First Time | |
2010-11-10 | Received On 11/10/2010 | |
2010-11-10 | Passed Roll Call # 534 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-11-10 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-10 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | |
2010-11-10 | Discharge Committee Approved | |
2010-06-30 | Referred To Committee On Finance |