MI SB1319 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0568'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0568'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses; professional corporations; citation to professional service corporation act in limited liability company act; revise. Amends secs. 102 & 902 of 1993 PA 23 (MCL 450.4102 & 450.4902). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1320'12
Title
Businesses; professional corporations; citation to professional service corporation act in limited liability company act; revise. Amends secs. 102 & 902 of 1993 PA 23 (MCL 450.4102 & 450.4902). TIE BAR WITH: SB 1320'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 780 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 764 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 764 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0568'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 5:30 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 3:35 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 1:18 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 780 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-11-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-28 | House | Received On 11/28/2012 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 764 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |