MI SB1262 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0289'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0289'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; violations; basic driver improvement course process; modify. Amends sec. 320d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.320d).
Title
Traffic control; violations; basic driver improvement course process; modify. Amends sec. 320d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.320d).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0289'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/16/2010 @ 11:58 Am | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/16/2010 @ 10:32 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/8/2010 @ 3:23 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-02 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-02 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 528 Yeas 100 Nays 0 | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-02 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-02 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-12-02 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-12-02 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-07-28 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2010-07-28 | Read A First Time | |
2010-07-28 | Received On 07/28/2010 | |
2010-07-28 | Passed Roll Call # 368 Yeas 31 Nays 0 Excused 6 Not Voting 1 | |
2010-07-21 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 | |
2010-07-21 | Substitute S-3 Concurred In | |
2010-07-21 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 | |
2010-06-30 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 | |
2010-06-30 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-06-30 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 | |
2010-04-14 | Referred To Committee On Transportation |