MI SB1261 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0485'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0485'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights; open meetings; procedures to accommodate the absence of members of a public body at public meetings; provide for. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.263).
Title
Civil rights; open meetings; procedures to accommodate the absence of members of a public body at public meetings; provide for. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.263).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 921 (Y: 73 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 797 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 797 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0485'18 |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 4:40 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/26/2018 @ 8:07 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2018 @ 3:26 Pm |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 921 Yeas 73 Nays 36 |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Received On 12/18/2018 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 797 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Adam Hollier |