MI SB1251 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - Referred To Committee On Commerce
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - Referred To Committee On Commerce
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; plant rehabilitation; definition of industrial property; revise. Amends sec. 2 of 1974 PA 198 (MCL 207.552).
Title
Economic development; plant rehabilitation; definition of industrial property; revise. Amends sec. 2 of 1974 PA 198 (MCL 207.552).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Referred To Committee On Commerce | |
2010-06-08 | Read A First Time | |
2010-06-08 | Received On 06/08/2010 | |
2010-06-08 | Passed Roll Call # 289 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-06-02 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-06-01 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-06-01 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-06-01 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-04-13 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform |