MI SB1243 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0621'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Economic development; other; appropriation of money from the transportation economic development fund to state trunk line fund; extend to 2013. Amends sec. 11 of 1987 PA 231 (MCL 247.911).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development; other; appropriation of money from the transportation economic development fund to state trunk line fund; extend to 2013. Amends sec. 11 of 1987 PA 231 (MCL 247.911).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 785 (Y: 70 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 787 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0621'12 With Immediate Effect
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 4:08 Pm
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:50 Pm
2012-12-31SenatePresented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 1:02 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-13SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2012-12-13HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 785 Yeas 70 Nays 36
2012-12-13HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-12HouseRead A Second Time
2012-12-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-12-05HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2012-11-29HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2012-11-29HouseRead A First Time
2012-11-29HouseReceived On 11/29/2012
2012-11-29SenatePassed Roll Call # 787 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-11-29SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-11-29SenateRules Suspended
2012-11-29SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2012-11-29SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2012-11-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2012-11-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-11-29SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2012-09-11SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

HB5826 (Same As) 2012-09-25 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-SB-1243
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2012-SIB-1243.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBS-1243.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2012-SEBH-1243.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2012-SNB-1243.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0621.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-11-29-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-05-078.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-13-082.htm

Bill Comments

feedback