MI HB5826 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-25 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-25 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; appropriation of money from the transportation economic development fund to state trunk line fund; extend to 2013. Amends sec. 11 of 1987 PA 231 (MCL 247.911).
Title
Economic development; other; appropriation of money from the transportation economic development fund to state trunk line fund; extend to 2013. Amends sec. 11 of 1987 PA 231 (MCL 247.911).
Sponsors
Rep. David Agema [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 539 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 539 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-09-19 | House | Transmitted |
2012-09-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 539 Yeas 105 Nays 0 |
2012-09-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-09-19 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-09-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-11 | House | Printed Bill Filed 08/16/2012 |
2012-08-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-08-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-08-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Dave Agema |
Same As/Similar To
SB1243 (Same As) 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0621'12 With Immediate Effect