MI SB1243 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; health care corporations; individual health coverage; regulate. Amends secs. 401e, 402b, 608, 609, 610, 612 & 613 of 1980 PA 350 (MCL 550.1401e et seq.) & adds secs. 220, 409b & 419c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1242'10, SB 1244'10, SB 1245'10
Title
Insurance; health care corporations; individual health coverage; regulate. Amends secs. 401e, 402b, 608, 609, 610, 612 & 613 of 1980 PA 350 (MCL 550.1401e et seq.) & adds secs. 220, 409b & 419c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1242'10, SB 1244'10, SB 1245'10
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 | |
2010-06-29 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-06-29 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 | |
2010-03-25 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
Same As/Similar To
HB6034 (Same As) 2010-04-14 - Printed Bill Filed 04/14/2010