MI SB1240 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 605'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 605'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
State; identification cards; declaration of United States citizenship on personal identification card application; require for automatic voter registration, and provide for automatic voter registration opt-out. Amends sec. 1 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.291).
Title
State; identification cards; declaration of United States citizenship on personal identification card application; require for automatic voter registration, and provide for automatic voter registration opt-out. Amends sec. 1 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.291).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 940 (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 719 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 719 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 605'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 5:22 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 1:51 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2018 @ 12:52 Pm |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 940 Yeas 60 Nays 48 |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Received On 12/06/2018 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 719 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Kowall |