MI SB1236 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0244'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0244'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; commercial redevelopment; incentives to invest in transit-oriented facilities and transit-oriented development; provide for. Amends secs. 3 & 4 of 1978 PA 255 (MCL 207.653 & 207.654).
Title
Economic development; commercial redevelopment; incentives to invest in transit-oriented facilities and transit-oriented development; provide for. Amends secs. 3 & 4 of 1978 PA 255 (MCL 207.653 & 207.654).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 0244'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2010 @ 1:40 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By Governor 12/14/2010 @ 11:18 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To Governor 12/8/2010 @ 3:01 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Given Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-02 | House Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-01 | Returned To Senate | |
2010-12-01 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-01 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 505 Yeas 70 Nays 32 | |
2010-12-01 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-11-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-09 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-09-29 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2010-09-29 | Read A First Time | |
2010-09-29 | Received On 09/29/2010 | |
2010-09-29 | Passed Roll Call # 484 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-09-28 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-09-28 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-09-23 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-09-23 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-09-23 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-03-18 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |