MI SB1223 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0276'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0276'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation: convention tourism assessments; state convention facility development act; modify. Amends secs. 3, 9, 10, 11, 12 & 20 of 1985 PA 106 (MCL 207.623 et seq.).
Title
Taxation: convention tourism assessments; state convention facility development act; modify. Amends secs. 3, 9, 10, 11, 12 & 20 of 1985 PA 106 (MCL 207.623 et seq.).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0276'22 |
2022-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2022 01:44 Pm |
2022-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2022 01:06 Pm |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2022 01:39 Pm |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-08 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-12-08 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-12-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 497 Yeas 70 Nays 27 Excused 0 Not Voting 12 |
2022-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-12-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-12-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-12-07 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-12-07 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2022-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-11-30 | House | Received On 11/29/2022 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 488 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2022-11-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |