MI SB1206 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0563'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0563'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; solid waste; bulk biosolids of exceptional quality used for landscaping; exempt from certain rules concerning cumulative loading, management practices, and reporting. Amends sec. 3131 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3131).
Title
Environmental protection; solid waste; bulk biosolids of exceptional quality used for landscaping; exempt from certain rules concerning cumulative loading, management practices, and reporting. Amends sec. 3131 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3131).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 760 (Y: 69 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 682 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 682 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0563'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 5:20 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 11:57 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 12:56 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-13 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 760 Yeas 69 Nays 40 |
2012-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Received On 09/27/2012 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 682 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
Subjects
Environmental protection, sewage
Environmental protection, solid waste
Environmental protection, water pollution
Environmental protection, solid waste
Environmental protection, water pollution