MI SB1196 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 688'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 688'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; landfills; hazardous waste landfills; regulate disposal of certain radioactive waste in. Amends secs. 11104 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11104) & adds sec. 11132.
Title
Environmental protection; landfills; hazardous waste landfills; regulate disposal of certain radioactive waste in. Amends secs. 11104 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11104) & adds sec. 11132.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 827 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 816 (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 675 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 816 (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 675 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 688'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 8:08 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 6:49 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/18/2018 @ 11:14 Am |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-13 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 827 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 816 Yeas 66 Nays 43 |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Amended |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2018 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 675 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |
Subjects
Energy: nuclear
Environmental protection: landfills
Environmental protection: radioactive waste
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
Environmental protection: landfills
Environmental protection: radioactive waste
State agencies (existing): environmental quality