MI SB1196 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0262'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Higher education; governing boards; authority to set amount of civil fines for certain civil infractions; revise. Amends sec. 2a of 1967 PA 291 (MCL 390.892a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education; governing boards; authority to set amount of civil fines for certain civil infractions; revise. Amends sec. 2a of 1967 PA 291 (MCL 390.892a).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-12-29 Assigned Pa 0262'10 With Immediate Effect
2010-12-29 Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2010 @ 2:16 Pm
2010-12-29 Approved By Governor 12/14/2010 @ 12:42 Pm
2010-12-15 Presented To Governor 12/8/2010 @ 3:21 Pm
2010-12-02 Ordered Enrolled
2010-12-02 Given Immediate Effect
2010-12-02 Returned To Senate
2010-12-02 Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 535 Yeas 65 Nays 34
2010-12-02 Read A Third Time
2010-12-02 Placed On Immediate Passage
2010-12-02 Placed On Third Reading
2010-12-02 Read A Second Time
2010-11-10 Referred To Second Reading
2010-11-10 Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2010-09-16 Referred To Committee On Judiciary
2010-09-16 Read A First Time
2010-09-16 Received On 09/16/2010
2010-09-16 Passed Roll Call # 421 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2010-07-01 Placed On Order Of Third Reading
2010-07-01 Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2010-06-29 Referred To Committee Of The Whole
2010-06-29 Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
2010-06-29 Reported Favorably Without Amendment
2010-03-03 Referred To Committee On Education

Same As/Similar To

HB5854 (Same As) 2010-03-17 - Referred To Second Reading

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback