MI SB1195 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 689'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 689'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; landfills; disposal of certain radioactive waste in landfills; impose fee on. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 11109.
Title
Environmental protection; landfills; disposal of certain radioactive waste in landfills; impose fee on. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 11109.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 815 (Y: 91 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 674 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 674 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 689'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 8:10 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 6:47 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/18/2018 @ 11:12 Am |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 815 Yeas 91 Nays 18 |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2018 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 674 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rebekah Warren |
Subjects
Energy: nuclear
Environmental protection: landfills
Environmental protection: radioactive waste
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
Environmental protection: landfills
Environmental protection: radioactive waste
State agencies (existing): environmental quality