MI SB1159 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Assigned Pa 0408'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Assigned Pa 0408'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; manufacturer; multiple manufacturing licenses and tasting rooms; provide for. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 536. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1154'18, SB 1155'18, SB 1156'18, SB 1160'18, SB 1161'18, SB 1164'18, SB 1165'18, SB 1166'18
Title
Liquor; manufacturer; multiple manufacturing licenses and tasting rooms; provide for. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 536. TIE BAR WITH: SB 1154'18, SB 1155'18, SB 1156'18, SB 1160'18, SB 1161'18, SB 1164'18, SB 1165'18, SB 1166'18
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hune [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 786 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 642 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 642 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0408'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2018 @ 3:22 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/19/2018 @ 11:53 Am |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/17/2018 @ 4:44 Pm |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-11 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 786 Yeas 104 Nays 2 |
2018-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-11 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2018 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 642 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Joe Hune |
Subjects
Liquor: beer
Liquor: licenses
Liquor: liquor control commission
Liquor: manufacturer
Liquor: other
Liquor: permits
Liquor: retail sales
Liquor: spirits
Liquor: wine
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Liquor: licenses
Liquor: liquor control commission
Liquor: manufacturer
Liquor: other
Liquor: permits
Liquor: retail sales
Liquor: spirits
Liquor: wine
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs