MI SB1135 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0615'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0615'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; services or financial assistance; program to provide energy assistance for low-income households; create. Creates new act.
Title
Human services; services or financial assistance; program to provide energy assistance for low-income households; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1093 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 888 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 429 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 888 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 429 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0615'12 |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 3:56 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:38 Pm |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 3:24 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 1093 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2012-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 888 Yeas 105 Nays 1 |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-14 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2012-05-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2012-05-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-31 | House | Received On 05/31/2012 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 429 Yeas 33 Nays 3 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |