MI SB1096 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on August 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-11 - Referred To Committee On Local, Intergovernmental, And Regional Affairs
Pending: House Local, Intergovernmental, And Regional Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-11 - Referred To Committee On Local, Intergovernmental, And Regional Affairs
Pending: House Local, Intergovernmental, And Regional Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cities; other; failure to pay civil fine and costs imposed by a city administrative hearings bureau; penalize under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 4q of 1909 PA 279 (MCL 117.4q).
Title
Cities; other; failure to pay civil fine and costs imposed by a city administrative hearings bureau; penalize under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 4q of 1909 PA 279 (MCL 117.4q).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 606 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Local, Intergovernmental, And Regional Affairs |
2012-09-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-08-15 | House | Received On 08/15/2012 |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 606 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-08-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |