MI SB1050 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0450'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0450'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; other; use of highway by public utilities; expand to include broadband companies. Amends title & secs. 13 & 14 of 1925 PA 368 (MCL 247.183 & 247.184).
Title
Highways; other; use of highway by public utilities; expand to include broadband companies. Amends title & secs. 13 & 14 of 1925 PA 368 (MCL 247.183 & 247.184).
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 836 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 853 (Y: 86 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 601 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 853 (Y: 86 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 601 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0450'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2018 @ 11:54 Am |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/20/2018 @ 6:37 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/20/2018 @ 3:28 Pm |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call # 836 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 853 Yeas 86 Nays 23 |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Received On 11/27/2018 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 601 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |