MI SB1039 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0373'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0373'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; conveyances; certain state-owned property located in Jackson county; exchange for certain privately owned property. Creates land transfer act.
Title
Property; conveyances; certain state-owned property located in Jackson county; exchange for certain privately owned property. Creates land transfer act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 665 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 469 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 469 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0373'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2012 @ 4:38 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/14/2012 @ 9:22 Am |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/13/2012 @ 9:18 Am |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-12-04 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 665 Yeas 105 Nays 0 |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-06-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-06-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-06-07 | House | Received On 06/07/2012 |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 469 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |