MI SB1022 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-21 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-21 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; other; establish process and liability exemption for certain information disclosed by former employing law enforcement agency to a law enforcement agency seeking to hire a law enforcement officer; provide for. Amends 1965 PA 203 (MCL 28.601 - 28.616) by adding secs. 9e & 9f.
Title
Law enforcement; other; establish process and liability exemption for certain information disclosed by former employing law enforcement agency to a law enforcement agency seeking to hire a law enforcement officer; provide for. Amends 1965 PA 203 (MCL 28.601 - 28.616) by adding secs. 9e & 9f.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 526 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-09-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-09-21 | House | Received On 09/21/2016 |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 526 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Subjects
Labor: fair employment practices
Labor: public service employment
Law enforcement: local police
Law enforcement: other
Law enforcement: state police
Labor: public service employment
Law enforcement: local police
Law enforcement: other
Law enforcement: state police