MI SB1004 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor: licenses; certain donations to nonprofits; allow. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 1016.
Title
Liquor: licenses; certain donations to nonprofits; allow. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 1016.
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis VanderWall [R] | Sen. Adam Hollier [D] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] |
Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 348 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-06-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-28 | House | Received On 06/23/2022 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 348 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis S. Vanderwall |