MI SB0999 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0364'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0364'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; recording; requirements for recording electronic documents; modify. Amends secs. 4 & 5 of 2010 PA 123 (MCL 565.844 & 565.845). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0664'17, SB 0664'17, SB 0996'18, SB 0996'18, SB 0997'18, SB 0997'18, SB 0998'18, SB 0998'18
Title
Property; recording; requirements for recording electronic documents; modify. Amends secs. 4 & 5 of 2010 PA 123 (MCL 565.844 & 565.845). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0664'17, SB 0664'17, SB 0996'18, SB 0996'18, SB 0997'18, SB 0997'18, SB 0998'18, SB 0998'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 641 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 407 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 407 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0364'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/12/2018 @ 4:32 Pm |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/12/2018 @ 12:20 Pm |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/5/2018 @ 9:40 Am |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-11-27 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-11-27 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-11-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 641 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-09-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2018-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-06 | House | Received On 06/06/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 407 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis Hertel |