MI SB0973 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; health; interstate health care compact; provide for. Creates new act.
Title
Insurance; health; interstate health care compact; provide for. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
Same As/Similar To
HB4693 (Same As) 2011-06-01 - Printed Bill Filed 06/01/2011