MI SB0972 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax: collections; suspension of sales tax on motor fuel; provide for. Amends sec. 6a of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.56a) & adds sec. 4ii.
Title
Sales tax: collections; suspension of sales tax on motor fuel; provide for. Amends sec. 6a of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.56a) & adds sec. 4ii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 287 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2022-06-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-05-26 | House | Received On 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 287 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tom Barrett |