MI SB0966 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Vetoed By Governor 12/29/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Vetoed By Governor 12/29/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; firearms; definition of firearm in NREPA; modify. Amends secs. 40102 & 43503 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40102 & 324.43503). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0979'14
Title
Weapons; firearms; definition of firearm in NREPA; modify. Amends secs. 40102 & 43503 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40102 & 324.43503). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0979'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 788 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 674 (Y: 98 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 559 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 674 (Y: 98 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 559 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-30 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 12/29/2014 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/18/2014 @ 5:04 Pm |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Roll Call # 788 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-16 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-11 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 674 Yeas 98 Nays 8 |
2014-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-10 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-12-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-09-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-24 | House | Received On 09/24/2014 |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 559 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-09-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2014-09-17 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-09-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |