MI SB0963 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Assigned Pa 0358'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Assigned Pa 0358'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; portion of M-13 in Bay County; designate as the "PFC Alan Robert Blohm Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 18a.
Title
Highways; name; portion of M-13 in Bay County; designate as the "PFC Alan Robert Blohm Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 18a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 595 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 628 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 399 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 628 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 399 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0358'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/6/2018 @ 4:26 Pm |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/6/2018 @ 4:10 Pm |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/30/2018 @ 12:58 Pm |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 595 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-08 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-11-08 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-11-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 628 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2018-11-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-08 | House | Amended |
2018-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-09-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-09-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-06 | House | Received On 06/06/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 399 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Green |