MI SB0962 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0513'16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0513'16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative procedure; rules; joint committee; provide for power to suggest changes to proposed rules. Amends secs. 5, 44, 45 & 45a of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.205 et seq.) & adds sec. 45c.
Title
Administrative procedure; rules; joint committee; provide for power to suggest changes to proposed rules. Amends secs. 5, 44, 45 & 45a of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.205 et seq.) & adds sec. 45c.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 842 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 732 (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 506 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 732 (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 506 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0513'16 |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2017 @ 11:34 Am |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/5/2017 @ 4:54 Pm |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/28/2016 @ 3:16 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-15 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Roll Call # 842 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-15 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-15 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 732 Yeas 62 Nays 46 |
2016-12-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2016-12-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 506 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-09-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight And Ethics |
2016-09-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-09-08 | House | Received On 09/08/2016 |
2016-09-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-09-07 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-09-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Stamas |