MI SB0959 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-07 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-07 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property; other; Michigan community foundation act; create. Creates new act & repeals secs. 1 & 4 of 1913 PA 380 (MCL 123.871 & 123.874), repeals secs. 15 & 602 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.15 & 380.602) & repeals 1921 PA 136 (MCL 397.381 - 397.382).
Title
Property; other; Michigan community foundation act; create. Creates new act & repeals secs. 1 & 4 of 1913 PA 380 (MCL 123.871 & 123.874), repeals secs. 15 & 602 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.15 & 380.602) & repeals 1921 PA 136 (MCL 397.381 - 397.382).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 696 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-12-07 | House | Received On 12/07/2016 |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 696 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |
Subjects
Education: intermediate school districts
Education: school districts
Libraries: other
Local government: other
Property: other
Education: school districts
Libraries: other
Local government: other
Property: other