MI SB0951 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School aid; payments; reference to deficit elimination plan compliance in school aid act; update, include enhanced deficit elimination plans, and revise other reporting requirements. Amends secs. 17a & 18 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1617a & 388.1618). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0952'14, SB 0954'14, SB 0957'14
Title
School aid; payments; reference to deficit elimination plan compliance in school aid act; update, include enhanced deficit elimination plans, and revise other reporting requirements. Amends secs. 17a & 18 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1617a & 388.1618). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0952'14, SB 0954'14, SB 0957'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 698 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 698 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-12-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Liability Reform |
2014-12-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-12-03 | House | Received On 12/03/2014 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 698 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Howard Walker |