MI SB0949 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-05 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 5372
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-05 - For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 5372
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; community colleges; provide for fiscal year 2012-2013. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; community colleges; provide for fiscal year 2012-2013. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 391 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 287 (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 222 (Y: 63 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 247 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 287 (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 222 (Y: 63 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 247 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Senate | For Final Disposition Of Budget, See Hb 5372 |
2012-05-30 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-05-30 | House | Conference Report Received |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 391 Yeas 21 Nays 15 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Conference Report Received In Senate |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Referred To Conference Committee 05/08/2012 |
2012-05-08 | House | House Conferees Named 05/08/2012: Reps. Ken Goike Bob Genetski Sean Mccann |
2012-05-08 | House | Senate Conferees Named 05/08/2012: Sens. Darwin Booher Roger Kahn Glenn Anderson |
2012-05-08 | House | Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute H-1 |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 05/08/2012: Sens. Darwin Booher, Roger Kahn, Glenn Anderson |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Roll Call # 287 Yeas 0 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Nonconcurred In |
2012-05-03 | Senate | House Amended Title |
2012-05-02 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-05-02 | House | Title Amended |
2012-05-02 | House | Passed Roll Call # 222 Yeas 63 Nays 47 |
2012-05-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-02 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-05-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-01 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2012-05-01 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2012-05-01 | House | Rule Suspended |
2012-04-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-04-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-04-25 | House | Received On 04/25/2012 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 247 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |