MI SB0943 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: construction and repair; definition of work zone; modify. Amends sec. 79d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.79d).
Title
Highways: construction and repair; definition of work zone; modify. Amends sec. 79d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.79d).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 355 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2022-06-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-28 | House | Received On 06/23/2022 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 355 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mark Huizenga |