MI SB0942 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-16 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-16 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for certain scrap tire and hazardous waste violations; establish. Amends sec. 13c, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13c). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0941'14
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for certain scrap tire and hazardous waste violations; establish. Amends sec. 13c, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13c). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0941'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 681 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 681 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2014-12-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Received On 11/13/2014 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 681 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |
Subjects
Criminal procedure, sentencing guidelines
Environmental protection, recycling
Environmental protection, solid waste
Environmental protection, recycling
Environmental protection, solid waste