MI SB0938 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-27 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-27 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities; nursing homes; patient care policies and compliance procedures; require establishment based on nationally recognized guidelines or best-practice resources, and provide other general amendments. Amends secs. 20155 & 21734 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20155 & 333.21734).
Title
Health facilities; nursing homes; patient care policies and compliance procedures; require establishment based on nationally recognized guidelines or best-practice resources, and provide other general amendments. Amends secs. 20155 & 21734 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20155 & 333.21734).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 531 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2014-08-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-08-27 | House | Received On 08/13/2014 |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 531 Yeas 33 Nays 0 Excused 5 Not Voting 0 |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Goeffrey Hansen |
Subjects
Health facilities, nursing homes
Health facilities, patient safety
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Health facilities, patient safety
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs