MI SB0929 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0559'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0559'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses; limited liability companies; mergers and conversions involving nonprofit corporations; allow. Amends sec. 705a of 1993 PA 23 (MCL 450.4705a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0623'13, SB 0624'13
Title
Businesses; limited liability companies; mergers and conversions involving nonprofit corporations; allow. Amends sec. 705a of 1993 PA 23 (MCL 450.4705a). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0623'13, SB 0624'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 716 (Y: 78 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 322 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 322 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0559'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 2:48 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 2:30 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 9:48 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 716 Yeas 78 Nays 30 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-11-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-11-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2014-05-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-28 | House | Received On 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 322 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Steven Bieda |
Subjects
Businesses, business corporations
Businesses, limited liability companies
Businesses, nonprofit corporations
Businesses, limited liability companies
Businesses, nonprofit corporations