MI SB0911 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Introduced By Senator Ken Horn
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Introduced By Senator Ken Horn
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; funding; environmental protection bond fund; modify criteria for grants. Amends secs. 19508, 19509 & 19510 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.19508 et seq.).
Title
Environmental protection; funding; environmental protection bond fund; modify criteria for grants. Amends secs. 19508, 19509 & 19510 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.19508 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 703 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 538 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 538 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ken Horn |
Subjects
Environmental protection: cleanups
Environmental protection: funding
Natural resources: funding
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
State agencies (existing): natural resources
Environmental protection: funding
Natural resources: funding
State agencies (existing): environmental quality
State agencies (existing): natural resources