MI SB0888 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Assigned Pa 328'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Retirement; public school employees; participation of certain student workers in retirement system; prohibit. Amends secs. 5 & 124 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1305 & 38.1424) & adds sec. 42a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement; public school employees; participation of certain student workers in retirement system; prohibit. Amends secs. 5 & 124 of 1980 PA 300 (MCL 38.1305 & 38.1424) & adds sec. 42a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 543 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 485 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 299 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-25SenateAssigned Pa 328'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-07-25SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 7/2/2018 @ 1:06 Pm
2018-07-25SenateApproved By Governor 6/28/2018 @ 6:32 Am
2018-07-25SenatePresented To Governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:38 Pm
2018-06-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-12SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-06-12SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-06-12Senate Roll Call # 543 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-06-12SenateHouse Substitute H-3 Concurred In
2018-06-12HouseReturned To Senate
2018-06-12HouseInserted Full Title
2018-06-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 485 Yeas 107 Nays 2
2018-06-12HouseRead A Third Time
2018-06-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-06-07HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted
2018-06-07HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-23HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-23HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3
2018-05-16HouseReferred To Committee On Financial Liability Reform
2018-05-16HouseRead A First Time
2018-05-16HouseReceived On 05/16/2018
2018-05-16SenatePassed Roll Call # 299 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-05-15SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3
2018-05-15SenateSubstitute S-3 Concurred In
2018-05-15SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3
2018-05-02SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-05-02SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-3
2018-03-06SenateReferred To Committee On Education
2018-03-06SenateIntroduced By Senator John Proos

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-SB-0888
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0888.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2018-SEBS-0888.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2018-SEBH-0888.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2018-SNB-0888.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0328.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-02-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-16-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-23-052.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-06-12-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-06-12-060.htm

Bill Comments

feedback