MI SB0888 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0450'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0450'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; adult foster care; rules preventing patient movement across licensure categories; exempt continuing care communities from. Amends sec. 10 of 1979 PA 218 (MCL 400.710). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0886'14, SB 0887'14, SB 0889'14
Title
Human services; adult foster care; rules preventing patient movement across licensure categories; exempt continuing care communities from. Amends sec. 10 of 1979 PA 218 (MCL 400.710). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0886'14, SB 0887'14, SB 0889'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 859 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 697 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 564 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 697 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 564 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0450'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2015 @ 2:50 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/31/2014 @ 4:26 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2014 @ 10:40 Am |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Roll Call # 859 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 697 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-09-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-24 | House | Received On 09/24/2014 |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 564 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |
Subjects
Health facilities, homes for the aged
Health facilities, hospices
Health facilities, long-term care facilities
Health facilities, nursing homes
Human services, adult foster care
Senior citizens, housing
Health facilities, hospices
Health facilities, long-term care facilities
Health facilities, nursing homes
Human services, adult foster care
Senior citizens, housing