MI SB0887 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 201'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 201'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax; exemptions; certain tangible personal property acquired by a contractor; exempt. Amends 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.91 - 205.111) by adding section 4ee.
Title
Use tax; exemptions; certain tangible personal property acquired by a contractor; exempt. Amends 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.91 - 205.111) by adding section 4ee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 449 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 215 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 215 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 201'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/20/2018 @ 1:32 Pm |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/19/2018 @ 8:32 Pm |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/13/2018 @ 2:02 Pm |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-06-05 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-06-05 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 449 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2018-06-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2018-04-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-19 | House | Received On 04/19/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 215 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jack Brandenburg |