MI SB0844 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 576'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 576'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; other; date on which criminal justice policy commission expires; extend. Amends sec. 33a, ch. IX of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 769.33a).
Title
Criminal procedure; other; date on which criminal justice policy commission expires; extend. Amends sec. 33a, ch. IX of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 769.33a).
Sponsors
Sen. John Proos [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1056 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1023 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 912 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 860 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 207 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1023 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 912 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 860 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 207 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 576'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 3:42 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 12:23 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2018 @ 1:38 Pm |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Roll Call # 1056 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Return Granted |
2018-12-21 | Senate | House Requests Return |
2018-12-21 | House | Retransmitted |
2018-12-21 | House | Passed Roll Call # 1023 Yeas 104 Nays 3 |
2018-12-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-12-21 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned As Requested |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Enrollment Vacated |
2018-12-19 | House | House Requests Return |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Roll Call # 912 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 860 Yeas 104 Nays 5 |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Amended |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-09-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-09-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-04-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-18 | House | Received On 04/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 207 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Proos |
Subjects
Corrections: jails
Criminal procedure: other
Criminal procedure: sentencing
State agencies (existing): corrections
Criminal procedure: other
Criminal procedure: sentencing
State agencies (existing): corrections