MI SB0838 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 575'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 575'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; bonds; time period for issuance of a security to pay off unfunded pension or postemployment health care liability; extend. Amends sec. 518 of 2001 PA 34 (MCL 141.2518).
Title
State financing and management; bonds; time period for issuance of a security to pay off unfunded pension or postemployment health care liability; extend. Amends sec. 518 of 2001 PA 34 (MCL 141.2518).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 918 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 871 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 682 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 682 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 871 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 682 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 682 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 575'18 With Immediate Effect 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 3:40 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2018 @ 12:21 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2018 @ 3:18 Pm |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Roll Call # 918 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 871 Yeas 103 Nays 6 |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2018-12-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Received On 12/05/2018 |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 682 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jack Brandenburg |