MI SB0822 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
State agencies (existing); executive office; contents and reporting of certain memoranda of understanding; modify. Creates new act.
Title
State agencies (existing); executive office; contents and reporting of certain memoranda of understanding; modify. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 862 (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 620 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 620 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2018 @ 3:36 Pm |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2018-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 862 Yeas 64 Nays 45 |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2018-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2018 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 620 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Mike Shirkey |