MI SB0815 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Assigned Pa 0152'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Assigned Pa 0152'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration; registration fee reduction for vans modified with a wheelchair lift mechanism; modify. Amends sec. 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.801).
Title
Vehicles; registration; registration fee reduction for vans modified with a wheelchair lift mechanism; modify. Amends sec. 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.801).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 262 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 169 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 169 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0152'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/16/2018 @ 10:16 Am |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Approved By Governor 5/15/2018 @ 2:00 Pm |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/8/2018 @ 1:35 Pm |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-05-01 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 262 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-05-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-03-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-03-20 | House | Received On 03/20/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 169 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kenneth Horn |