MI SB0806 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0385'16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0385'16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; school districts; training and local policies concerning administration of opioid antagonists in public schools; provide for. Amends secs. 5 & 1178 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.5 & 380.1178) & adds sec. 1179b.
Title
Education; school districts; training and local policies concerning administration of opioid antagonists in public schools; provide for. Amends secs. 5 & 1178 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.5 & 380.1178) & adds sec. 1179b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 697 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 584 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 584 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0385'16 |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2016 @ 1:30 Pm |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/28/2016 @ 1:13 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2016 @ 2:18 Pm |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 697 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2016-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-11-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2016-11-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-11-09 | House | Received On 10/20/2016 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 584 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale Zorn |
Same As/Similar To
HB5379 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/17/2016
Subjects
Education: safety
Education: school districts
Health: emergency response
State agencies (existing): community health
State agencies (existing): education
State agencies (existing): human services
Education: school districts
Health: emergency response
State agencies (existing): community health
State agencies (existing): education
State agencies (existing): human services